NH HB1581 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - House Signed by the Governor 05/18/2010; Effective 07/01/2010; Chapter 0060

Summary

Relative to the taxation of railroads.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the taxation of railroads.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-24 House Signed by the Governor 05/18/2010; Effective 07/01/2010; Chapter 0060
2010-05-05 House Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1914
2010-05-05 Senate Enrolled
2010-04-21 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution
2010-04-21 Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg
2010-04-14 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 4/21/10; Senate Calendar 16
2010-04-07 Senate Hearing: April 13, 2010, Room 100, State House, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15
2010-03-24 Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 11, Pg.264
2010-03-03 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0535h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1164-1165
2010-03-03 House Amendment #0535h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1164-1165
2010-02-12 House Proposed Committee Amendment #0535h; House Calendar 17, PG.907-908
2010-02-12 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0535h for Mar 3 Consent Calendar (Vote 18-0); House Calendar 17, PG.816
2010-02-03 House Executive Session: 2/11/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2010-02-03 House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/9/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2010-01-27 House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/2/2010 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2010-01-20 House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 1/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2009-12-22 House Public Hearing: 1/7/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2009-12-10 House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 6, PG.245

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback