NH HB158 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 218-144 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 218-144 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to induced termination of pregnancy statistics.
Title
Relative to induced termination of pregnancy statistics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - ITL (Y: 218 N: 144 NV: 15 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 218-144 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 38 |
2019-02-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0003h |
2019-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 12 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 39 |