NH HB1578 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to samples from nano breweries.
Title
Relative to samples from nano breweries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0705h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 11 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0705h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 11 |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0705h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 7 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 08:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/23/2018 11:35 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 16 |