NH HB1577 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Lay HB1577 on Table (Rep. Ebel): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-188 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Lay HB1577 on Table (Rep. Ebel): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-188 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to digital images of ballots.
Title
Relative to digital images of ballots.
Sponsors
Rep. Alvin See [R] | Rep. Clayton Wood [R] | Rep. Cyril Aures [R] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] |
Rep. Jose Cambrils [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Rep. Robert Wherry [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - Table (Y: 193 N: 188 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 193 N: 182 NV: 14 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 193 N: 182 NV: 14 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Lay HB1577 on Table (Rep. Ebel): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-188 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 50 |
2024-04-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-04-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1347h 04/03/2024 (Vote 13-12; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 13 |
2024-03-27 | House | Executive Session: 04/02/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-03-21 | House | Division Work Session: 03/27/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-03-14 | House | Division Work Session: 03/20/2024 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-02-28 | House | Division Work Session: 03/13/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 100 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0598h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-182 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 98 |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2024-0598h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 97 |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/13/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) |
2024-02-07 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-31 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2024 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-26 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 25 |