NH HB1577 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 82; Eff. 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 82; Eff. 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exemptions from prosecution for victims of human trafficking.
Title
Relative to exemptions from prosecution for victims of human trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. Daryl Abbas [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. John Bordenet [D] | Rep. Jennifer Rhodes [R] |
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter 82; Eff. 01/01/2023 |
2022-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/14/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 01/21/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2022 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |