NH HB1575 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 77; Eff. 7/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting hunting with an air rifle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting hunting with an air rifle.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 77; Eff. 7/1/2018
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled 04/26/2018
2018-04-18HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1497e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 30
2018-04-17SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1497e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13
2018-04-05SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-21SenateHearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0594h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 44
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0594h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 44
2018-02-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0594h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 25
2018-02-21HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 307
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2018 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 1 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback