NH HB1567 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - House Signed By Governor 05/29/2012; Effective 05/29/2012; Chapter 0092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - House Signed By Governor 05/29/2012; Effective 05/29/2012; Chapter 0092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the federal Youth Corrections Act.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the federal Youth Corrections Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | House Signed By Governor 05/29/2012; Effective 05/29/2012; Chapter 0092 | |
2012-05-17 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.2480 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-05-09 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1278s (Rep Jasper): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2227 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1278s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.328 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee Amendment 1278s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.287 | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1278s, 3/28/12; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === 3/15/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 2:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Hearing: 3/15/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 2:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9A | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 6, Pg.145 | |
2012-02-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.909 | |
2012-02-02 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 15 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.680 | |
2012-01-24 | House Executive Session: 2/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-01-03 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2011-12-16 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 7, PG. 360 |