NH HB1566 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 12-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 12-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to warrant requirements.
Title
Relative to warrant requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-30 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 12-1) |
2014-10-09 | House | Executive Session: 10/15/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-09-18 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 10/1/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-08-28 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 9/17/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-03-12 | House | Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/30/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304=Room Change= |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |