NH HB1564 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of polystyrene foam.
Title
Prohibiting the use of polystyrene foam.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Balch [D] | Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] | Rep. Catherine Sofikitis [D] | Rep. Judith Spang [D] |
Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 194 N: 129 NV: 30 Abs: 43) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0176h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-129 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 137 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0176h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 137 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0176h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 40 |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 27 |