NH HB1563 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of funds in the drug forfeiture fund.
Title
Relative to the use of funds in the drug forfeiture fund.
Sponsors
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] |
Rep. Alan Bershtein [R] | Rep. Rene Nunez [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - OTP (Y: 329 N: 21 NV: 20 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5 |
2020-05-28 | House | Executive Session: 06/01/2020 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/92613036532 |
2020-05-14 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/20/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCxqjz56akoWRL_5vyaQDtvQ/videos |
2020-05-07 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 05/12/2020 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/91719044913 |
2020-03-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-03-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/09/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-02-26 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 03/05/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-02-26 | House | Public Hearing: 03/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 27 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 329-21 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 27 |
2020-02-19 | House | Special Order to front of regular calendar (Rep. Spillane): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 27 |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-06 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 23 |
2020-01-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 27 |