NH HB1562 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 301; Eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 301; Eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to collaboration between the department of health and human services and foster parents and relative to the disposition of interests in condominium units.
Title
Relative to collaboration between the department of health and human services and foster parents and relative to the disposition of interests in condominium units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 301; Eff. 8/24/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 1977c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1977c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-1977c; 05/16/2018 |
2018-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/14/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Carson, Fuller Clark; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. K. Rice, Hunt, Itse, Walz 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1772s and Requests CofC (Rep. K. Rice): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1772s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1772s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1772s, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1772s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Hearing: 04/24/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:05 pm, on proposed amendment # 2018-1490s; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Hearing: 04/24/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm, on proposed amendment # 2018-1550s; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0642h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 6 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0642h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 6 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0642h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 4 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-02-06 | House | ==CONTINUED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2018-02-02 | House | ==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2018 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-31 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-24 | House | ==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/02/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building TBA |
2017-11-09 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 15 |