NH HB1558 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2020; Chapter 38; I. RSA 193:13/ I-X as inserted by Sec. 1 Eff: 07/01/2021 II. Sec. 3-5 & 8-10 Eff: 07/01/2020 III.Sec 6 & 7 Eff: 06/30/2020 IV. Sec. 17 and 31-36 Eff: 01/01/2021 V. Sec. 11-16 and 18-30 Eff: 09/27/2020 VI. Rem. Eff: 07/29/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2020; Chapter 38; I. RSA 193:13/ I-X as inserted by Sec. 1 Eff: 07/01/2021 II. Sec. 3-5 & 8-10 Eff: 07/01/2020 III.Sec 6 & 7 Eff: 06/30/2020 IV. Sec. 17 and 31-36 Eff: 01/01/2021 V. Sec. 11-16 and 18-30 Eff: 09/27/2020 VI. Rem. Eff: 07/29/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to discipline of students, addressing students' behavioral needs, and making an appropriation therefor; kindergarten funding; violence in schools; policies for students with head injuries; child sexual abuse prevention education and training; authorizing the issuance of bonds or notes by a municipality; adding the chancellor of the university system of New Hampshire to the department of business and economic affairs council of partner agencies; change of school or assignment due to manifest educational hardship; school board expenditure of year-end fund balances; a children's system of care; student wellness; and criminal background checks for bus drivers.
Title
Relative to discipline of students, addressing students' behavioral needs, and making an appropriation therefor; kindergarten funding; violence in schools; policies for students with head injuries; child sexual abuse prevention education and training; authorizing the issuance of bonds or notes by a municipality; adding the chancellor of the university system of New Hampshire to the department of business and economic affairs council of partner agencies; change of school or assignment due to manifest educational hardship; school board expenditure of year-end fund balances; a children's system of care; student wellness; and criminal background checks for bus drivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 350 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2020; Chapter 38; I. RSA 193:13/ I-X as inserted by Sec. 1 Eff: 07/01/2021 II. Sec. 3-5 & 8-10 Eff: 07/01/2020 III.Sec 6 & 7 Eff: 06/30/2020 IV. Sec. 17 and 31-36 Eff: 01/01/2021 V. Sec. 11-16 and 18-30 Eff: 09/27/2020 VI. Rem. Eff: 07/29/2020 |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-07-16 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 74 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1619e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1619e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 70 |
2020-06-30 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Myler): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-129 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 28 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2020-1447s and 2020-1511s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2020-1511s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1447s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1447s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/10/2020, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | The following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 5. Webinar ID: 943 8186 9248 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,94381869248# or 19292056099,,94381869248# Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_DxJlsaqKRR6W0xV8gOxVTQ Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Members of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Committee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/10/2020, 01:05 pm, on proposed amendment # 2020-1384s; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 18 |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 12 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2020 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 26 |