NH HB1557 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-96 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring meetings and sessions of committees of the house of representatives to be recorded and made available on the Internet.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring meetings and sessions of committees of the house of representatives to be recorded and made available on the Internet.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-15 - House - ITL (Y: 236 N: 96 NV: 19 Abs: 40) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-96 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 11
2018-02-09HouseSpecial Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 3 P. 81
2018-02-09HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 81
2018-02-08HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. McConnell) 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 2
2018-01-26HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 11
2018-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/10/2018 Legislative Office Building 104
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2017-11-09HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback