NH HB1556 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-16 - Executive Session: 10/20/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-16 - Executive Session: 10/20/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Lucky 7 tickets.
Title
Relative to Lucky 7 tickets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 10/20/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-09-16 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 10/20/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-09-07 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/14/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-02-10 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 15 P. 5 |
2016-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/10/2016 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 4 |
2016-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 01/27/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building306 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 4 P. 18 |