NH HB1554 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing exemptions under the interest and dividends tax and decreasing the total amount of research and development credits against business taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing exemptions under the interest and dividends tax and decreasing the total amount of research and development credits against business taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - House - Committee Amendment 1621 (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 182 N: 143 NV: 30 Abs: 36) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenatePending Motion Ought to Pass; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Morse Moved Laid on Table, 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Avard Withdraws his request for a Roll Call; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Avard Requests a Roll Call; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Morse Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1621s, Regular Calendar 11Y-12N, Amendment Failed; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-26SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1621s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-26SenateSpecial Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14
2018-04-18SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1621s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-15SenateHearing: 03/21/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 13
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 7
2018-02-22HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-143 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 49
2018-02-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-02-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/22/2018 (Vote 13-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 21
2018-02-07HouseExecutive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 202
2018-02-01HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-01-24HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-11-09HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback