NH HB1554 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a state sports lottery.
Title
Establishing a state sports lottery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 71 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 45 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-01-27 | House | Work Session: 02/04/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building202 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 4 P. 18 |