NH HB1552 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 267; I. Sec 10 eff 9/1/2023 II. Sec 1-9 eff 01/01/2023 III. Rem eff. 06/24/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 267; I. Sec 10 eff 9/1/2023 II. Sec 1-9 eff 01/01/2023 III. Rem eff. 06/24/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a board for the certification of assessing persons.
Title
Establishing a board for the certification of assessing persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Table (Y: 124 N: 221 NV: 14 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 267; I. Sec 10 eff 9/1/2023 II. Sec 1-9 eff 01/01/2023 III. Rem eff. 06/24/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2022-1747s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Ought to Pass; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved to Remove HB 1552 from the Consent Calendar; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/28/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1747s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 04/13/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-31 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed DV 88-258 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | Lay HB1552 on Table (Rep. Leishman): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 124-221 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-14 | House | Division Work Session: 03/14/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/23/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-03-04 | House | Referred to Finance 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2022-0519h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0519h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0519h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2022 10:45 am Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2022 10:45 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-12-14 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |