NH HB1550 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the right of children and teenagers to testify in family court proceedings.
Title
Relative to the right of children and teenagers to testify in family court proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-12-14 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Children and Family Law |