NH HB1550 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 12-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting the audio and video recording of a public official while in the course of his or her official duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting the audio and video recording of a public official while in the course of his or her official duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - OTP (Y: 88 N: 200 NV: 70 Abs: 32) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-10-30HouseInterim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 12-1)
2014-10-09HouseExecutive Session: 10/15/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2014-09-18HouseInterim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 10/8/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2014-08-28HouseInterim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 9/17/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2014-03-05HouseRefer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2014-03-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 88-200
2014-02-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2014-02-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13
2014-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 2/11/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2014-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 1/21/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2013-12-16HouseIntroduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback