NH HB1547 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to per fluorinated chemical remediation in soil and procedures for certain hazardous waste generators.
Title
Relative to per fluorinated chemical remediation in soil and procedures for certain hazardous waste generators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2130e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2130e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report 2022-2014c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2014c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2022-2014c; 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/16/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Daniels, Bradley, Watters; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Avard Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1937s 050522 and Requests CofC (Reps. Pearl, Aron, Bixby, Emerick): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [&] House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1937s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1937s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1937s, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 04/14/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-31 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/23/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-03-01 | House | Division II Work Session: 03/14/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2022-0249h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Finance 02/16/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0249h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0249h (NT) (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-01-13 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Environment and Agriculture |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |