NH HB1544 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the placement of construction and demolition debris in landfills.
Title
Prohibiting the placement of construction and demolition debris in landfills.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-04 | House | Executive Session: 01/19/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-12-14 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |