NH HB1544 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-150 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-150 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to identify the requirements needed to commit New Hampshire to a goal of 100 percent renewable energy for electricity by 2040.
Title
Establishing a committee to identify the requirements needed to commit New Hampshire to a goal of 100 percent renewable energy for electricity by 2040.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - ITL (Y: 175 N: 150 NV: 35 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-150 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 41 |
2018-03-16 | House | Suspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 75 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 14 |