NH HB1535 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 203; 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 203; 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a one-time allowance for certain state retirees.
Title
Relative to a one-time allowance for certain state retirees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 203; 07/01/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved Ought to Pass; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 9Y-15N, Motion Failed; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1683s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1683s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1683s, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 04/13/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-31 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1151h: Motion Adopted DV 218-100 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | Amendment # 2022-1151h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1151h (NT) (Vote 18-3; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-18 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division I Work Session: 03/22/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2022-03-14 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division Work Session: 03/18/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/23/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-03-09 | House | Division Work Session: 03/01/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2022-03-01 | House | Division Work Session: 03/09/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Finance 02/17/2022 House Journal 4 |
2022-02-25 | House | Amendment # 2022-0551h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/17/2022 House Journal 4 |
2022-02-18 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0551h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/17/2022 House Journal 4 |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0551h (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2022 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/21/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-12-09 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |