NH HB1533 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Limiting the increase in property taxes for certain persons

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting the increase in property taxes for certain persons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseDied on Table
2020-03-13HouseLay on Table (Rep. Roy): Motion Adopted DV 282-7 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 177
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 69
2020-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 02/18/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback