NH HB1531 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the release of voting information in a presidential election.
Title
Relative to the release of voting information in a presidential election.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Prout [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] |
Rep. Tony Lekas [R] | Rep. Peter Torosian [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 10 |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 6 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 25 |