NH HB153 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to circumstances under which police officer disciplinary records shall be public documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to circumstances under which police officer disciplinary records shall be public documents.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:20 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0374h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 45
2019-03-07HouseAmendment # 2019-0374h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 45
2019-02-28HouseSpecial Order to 03/07/2019 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 62
2019-02-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0374h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 31
2019-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-31HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 39

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback