NH HB1528 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-123 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-123 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting discrimination in the university and community college systems.
Title
Prohibiting discrimination in the university and community college systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - ITL (Y: 210 N: 123 NV: 24 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-123 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 74 |
2018-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 38 |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 14 |