NH HB1525 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of political advocacy organization.
Title
Relative to the definition of political advocacy organization.
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Lane [D] | Rep. David Huot [D] | Rep. Betty Gay [R] | Rep. Peg Higgins [D] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - OTP (Y: 198 N: 124 NV: 23 Abs: 51) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-124 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 69 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 52 |
2020-02-12 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 25 |