NH HB1519 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a minor's available work hours.
Title
Relative to a minor's available work hours.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 12 |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/06/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-24 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 1 P. 23 |