NH HB1519 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Enrolled 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the conduct of condominium unit owners' associations votes without a meeting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the conduct of condominium unit owners' associations votes without a meeting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-02SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-03SenateHearing: 04/24/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0722h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 11
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0722h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 11
2018-02-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0722h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 6
2018-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302
2018-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback