NH HB1518 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 44; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 44; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that motor vehicle lighting and safety equipment be approved by the director of the division of motor vehicles.
Title
Repealing the requirement that motor vehicle lighting and safety equipment be approved by the director of the division of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. Thomas Walsh [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 44; Eff. 7/14/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/13/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 15 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 17 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 13 |