NH HB1517 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a pollinator solar scorecard.
Title
Creating a pollinator solar scorecard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-2; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2022 02:00 am Legislative Office Building 301--303 |
2022-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2022 1:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2021-12-09 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Environment and Agriculture |