NH HB1516 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 181-174 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the source of funds for education freedom accounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the source of funds for education freedom accounts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-22HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 181-174 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
2022-02-10HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2022-02-10HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar)
2022-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 02/09/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2022-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/21/2022 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
2021-12-09HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback