NH HB1515 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 249; Eff. 8/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to an exemption from the combustion ban on construction and demolition debris.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to an exemption from the combustion ban on construction and demolition debris.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - OTPA (Y: 182 N: 147 NV: 32 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 249; Eff. 8/11/2018
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1799s and 1883s (Rep. Barry): Motion Adopted DV 173-146 05/10/2018
2018-05-03SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2018-1799s and 2018-1883s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Woodburn Floor Amendment # 2018-1883s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1799s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1799s, 05/03/2018;
2018-05-02SenateSpecial Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018
2018-05-02SenateSen. Woodburn Moved to Remove HB 1515 from the Consent Calendar; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-26SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1799s, 05/02/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-17SenateHearing: 04/24/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0560h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-147 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 105
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0560h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 105
2018-02-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-02-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0560h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 47
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 304
2018-01-30HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/06/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback