NH HB1514 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-92 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-92 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to shelter-in-place orders.
Title
Relative to shelter-in-place orders.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Ammon [R] | Rep. Brian Stone [R] | Rep. Werner Horn [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - ITL (Y: 236 N: 92 NV: 34 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-92 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 120 |
2018-02-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 50 |
2018-02-14 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-02-07 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 13 |