NH HB1513 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the board of directors of the Pease development authority.
Title
Relative to the board of directors of the Pease development authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 94 |
2024-03-18 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 18 |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-03-06 | House | Public Hearing: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 23 |