NH HB1511 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to actions against tenants.
Title
Relative to actions against tenants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 141 |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 63 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 25 |