NH HB1511 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Lay HB 1511 on Table (Rep. Eaton): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 204-121 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the death of a fetus for the purpose of certain homicide charges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the death of a fetus for the purpose of certain homicide charges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-15 - House - Table (Y: 204 N: 121 NV: 29 Abs: 37) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseLay HB 1511 on Table (Rep. Eaton): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 204-121 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 28
2018-02-09HouseSpecial Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 3 P. 81
2018-01-31HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0096h (NT)
2018-01-31HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/07/2018 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar)
2018-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/16/2018 Legislative Office Building 204
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 01:40 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback