NH HB1509 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Removed from Consent (Rep. Horrigan) 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Removed from Consent (Rep. Horrigan) 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to termination of the FRM victims' contribution recovery fund.
Title
Relative to termination of the FRM victims' contribution recovery fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Horrigan) 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Lay HB1509 on Table (Rep. Horgan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-03 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/10/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-26 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/02/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/26/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-12-09 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Ways and Means |