NH HB1505 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/20/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to compensation of college athletes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to compensation of college athletes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseReferral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/20/2020
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 2
2020-02-13HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0089h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 2
2020-02-13HouseAmendment # 2020-0089h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 2
2020-01-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0089h for 02/13/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 2
2020-01-22HouseExecutive Session: 01/28/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2020-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback