NH HB1505 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the MasoniCare charter.
Title
Relative to the MasoniCare charter.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 10 |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 6 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2018 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 13 |