NH HB1504 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to special purpose depository institutions.
Title
Relative to special purpose depository institutions.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Ammon [R] | Rep. Joe Alexander [R] | Rep. Jason Osborne [R] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] |
Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Lex Berezhny [R] | Rep. Tim Baxter [R] | Rep. Nick White [R] |
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2022 1:15 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/02/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 2:45 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |