NH HB1498 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 06/22/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 06/22/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a safety program for off highway recreational vehicles and snowmobiles.
Title
Establishing a safety program for off highway recreational vehicles and snowmobiles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 06/22/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-03-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote ; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-01-26 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2022 2:45 p.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |