NH HB1498 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to alternate certification pathways for career and technical education instructors.
Title
Relative to alternate certification pathways for career and technical education instructors.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Kathleen Hoelzel [R] | Rep. John Graham [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] |
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Moved Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/19/2018 Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:05 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 7 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/22/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 7 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 13 |