NH HB1495 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 299; Eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 299; Eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to standards for determining an adequate education.
Title
Relative to standards for determining an adequate education.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. James Grenier [R] | Rep. Terry Wolf [R] |
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 299; Eff. 8/24/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2080e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2080e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1248s (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1248s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1248s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1248s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0796h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 24 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0796h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 24 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0796h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 13 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-24 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 09:50 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 12 |