NH HB1493 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 42; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 42; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the statewide assessment system of performance in schools.
Title
Relative to the statewide assessment system of performance in schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Robert Elliott [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] |
Rep. Victoria Sullivan [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 42; Eff. 7/14/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/20/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0675h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 24 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0675h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 24 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0675h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 13 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-24 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 12 |