NH HB1492 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 320-11 03/05/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a tax on the retail sale of certain electronic devices to fund education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a tax on the retail sale of certain electronic devices to fund education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - ITL (Y: 320 N: 11 NV: 33 Abs: 32) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 320-11 03/05/2020
2020-02-20HouseSpecial Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020
2020-02-19HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. J. Osborne) 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 2
2020-02-05HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 17
2020-01-22HouseExecutive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2020 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback