NH HB1492 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a course of action when a child's attendance at a school has resulted in a manifest educational hardship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a course of action when a child's attendance at a school has resulted in a manifest educational hardship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
2018-09-10HouseExecutive Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
2018-09-04HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2018-08-21House==CANCELLED== Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
2018-08-21HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/04/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
2018-03-06HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 24
2018-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 13
2018-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 207
2018-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 12

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback