NH HB1491 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the repricing of heating fuel subsequent to a concluded sale.
Title
Prohibiting the repricing of heating fuel subsequent to a concluded sale.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/20/2024 (Vote 17-; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 8 |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-03-13 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/19/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/13/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 22 |