NH HB1491 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the disposition of meals and rooms tax revenues to town and cities.
Title
Relative to the disposition of meals and rooms tax revenues to town and cities.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] | Rep. Michael Edgar [D] | Rep. Peter Spanos [R] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Rep. Rio Tilton [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 17 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 22-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 18 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 12 |